+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 12, 2023 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0800)
- Enacted, Chapter 800 (effective 7/1/23)
On April 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 12, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2375ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 12, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 27, 2023 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 2, 2023 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2375ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 31, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 2023 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
On January 23, 2023 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: K-12
On January 16, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented and ordered printed 23104453D