+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0739)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 739 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2375ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2375H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 11105022D-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 11105022D-H1
- Reported from Science and Technology with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology
- Presented and ordered printed 11103247D
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 2011: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2011: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2011: Reported from Science and Technology with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor