+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 31, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0322)
On March 22, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 322 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 2, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2373ER)
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (91-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 1999 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 990442297-E
- Read second time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Passed House (86-Y 13-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 13-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Reported from C. J. with amendment (22-Y 2-N)
On January 26, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 990442297
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
February 23, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1999: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1999: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd. (15-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 13-N)
February 7, 1999: Reported from C. J. with amendment (22-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor