+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (44)
On March 26, 2023 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 561 (effective 7/1/23)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0561)
On March 13, 2023 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2370ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2023 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 23107512D-H1
- Amended by conference committee
On February 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2023 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senators: Surovell, Petersen, Stuart
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 23, 2023 in the House:
- Delegates: Scott, D.L., Adams, L.R., Williams
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 23106945D-S1 (0-Y 99-N)
On February 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 23106945D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2370S1
On February 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 23106945D-S1
- Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2023 in the House:
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 23104141D-E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2370E
On February 5, 2023 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2023 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 13, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 23104141D
+ − Impact Statements (4)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (10)
February 24, 2023: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2023: VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2023: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2023: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
February 20, 2023: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2023: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2023: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2023: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2023: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2023: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor