+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 29, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0115)
On March 28, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 115 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 28, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB237ER)
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture (19-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture sub-committee: 1
On January 17, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (5)
February 23, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 1994: Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1994: Reported from Agriculture (19-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor