+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 15, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1006)
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- House concurred in Gov. recomm. (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2365ER2)
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Rec. of Gov's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 1006 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 29, 1999 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2365ER)
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 990212114-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from L. & C. with amendment (23-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to L. & C. sub-committee: 1
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed 990212114