+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0022)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 22 (effective 7/1/19)
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 19, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 12, 2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2365ER)
- Enrolled
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate
- Read third time
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 19100985D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2365E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100985D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 7, 2019: Passed Senate
February 6, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2019: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2019: Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor