+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- Tabled in Appropriations (24-Y 1-N)
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to App. sub-committee: 7
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (20-Y 1-N)
On January 28, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 2
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/04 047609142
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 13, 2004: Tabled in Appropriations (24-Y 1-N)
January 29, 2004: Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (20-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor