+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 20, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0375)
On March 19, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 375 (effective 7/1/01)
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2356ER)
On February 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2001 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 010353984-H1
- Read second time
On February 4, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute agreed to 010353984-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2001 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 010353984-H1
On February 1, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (23-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2001 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 010318984
+ − Votes (7)
February 16, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2001: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2001: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2001: Reported from C. J. with substitute (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor