+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 8, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0522)
On April 5, 2002 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 522 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 9, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB235ER)
On March 6, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2002 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 4, 2002 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 027900444-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 027900444-S1
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 027900444-S1
On February 27, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with sub (15-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2002 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 1
On February 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 2-N)
On February 5, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 027825742-E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
On February 4, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amds (22-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2002 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 2
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/04/02 027825742
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
March 6, 2002: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2002: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2002: Reported from General Laws with sub (15-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N)
January 31, 2002: Reported from General Laws with amds (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor