+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (45)
On May 5, 1995 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On April 6, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (43-Y 54-N)
- House rejected Gov's recommendation (43-Y 54-N)
- Communicated to Governor
On March 27, 1995 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 1995 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 23, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2347ER)
On February 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- Floor substitute rejected (Stosch)
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Floor substitute printed LD2295743-S1 (Stosch)
- Passed Senate (31-Y 8-N)
- Passed Senate (33-Y 5-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (33-Y 5-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (31-Y 8-N)
On February 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 1-N)
On February 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (14-Y 1-N)
On February 8, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 7, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute rejected LD2883412-H1
- Floor substitute agreed to LD7398468-H2 (Thomas)
- Floor substitute printed LD7398468-H2 (Thomas)
- Floor amendment agreed to (Bloxom)
- Eng. by House -fl. sub. w/amd. LD7398468-EH2 (Thomas)
- Printed as engrossed LD7398468-EH2
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Passed House (95-Y 5-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 5-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 6, 1995 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute printed LD2883412-H1
On February 5, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from General Laws with sub. (14-Y 8-N)
On January 26, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 6
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed LD8727801
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
April 6, 1995: VOTE: REJECTED (43-Y 54-N)
February 17, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (33-Y 5-N)
February 17, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (31-Y 8-N)
February 17, 1995: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1995: Reported from Finance (14-Y 1-N)
February 16, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1995: Reported from General Laws (14-Y 1-N)
February 7, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 5-N)
February 5, 1995: Reported from General Laws with sub. (14-Y 8-N)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor