+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0035)
On March 16, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 35 (effective 7/1/03)
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2346ER)
On February 12, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 1-N)
On February 11, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 17, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 15, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 14, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 036695984
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 12, 2003: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
February 10, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2003: Reported from Ed. & H. with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 14, 2003: Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor