+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 24, 2023 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0487)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 487 (effective 7/1/23)
On March 2, 2023 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
On February 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2344ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2023 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2023 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (19-Y 2-N)
On January 26, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2023 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 12, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented and ordered printed 23100951D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 21, 2023: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2023: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2023: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2023: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2023: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (19-Y 2-N)
January 26, 2023: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor