+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 31, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0384)
On March 24, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 384 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 9, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2343ER)
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Senate sub. agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 991240309-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 991240309-S1
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 991240309-S1
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with sub. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Science and Technology (21-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology
- Presented & ordered printed 994580860
+ − Votes (8)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1999: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1999: Reported from General Laws with sub. (15-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1999: Reported from Science and Technology (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor