+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 31, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546)
On March 22, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 546 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2342ER)
On February 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 7, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 5-N)
- Read third time and passed House (92-Y 5-N)
On February 5, 2005 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2342H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 053596476-H1
- Read second time
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 053596476-H1
- Reported from Tra. w/sub (20-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: Subcommittee # 2
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 053503476