+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 26, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0425)
On March 16, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 425 (effective 7/1/03)
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2340ER)
On February 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (37-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to S. Rule 20(j), rerefer. by C.J. (13-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to General Laws
On January 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 22, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 20, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 16, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 1
On January 13, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 032360736
+ − Votes (6)
February 17, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2003: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2003: Pursuant to S. Rule 20(j), rerefer. by C.J. (13-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2003: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor