+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to pass by indefinitely rejected (32-Y 63-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (32-Y 63-N)
- Motion to refer to committee agreed to
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (15-Y 7-N)
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: #2
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Presented and ordered printed 13104277D
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
+ − Votes (3)
January 30, 2013: VOTE: REJECTED (32-Y 63-N)
January 25, 2013: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (15-Y 7-N)
January 24, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor