+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On May 1, 2003 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (26-Y 73-N)
- House rejected Gov's recommendation (26-Y 73-N)
- Pending question ordered
- Placed on Calendar
- Communicated to Governor
On March 24, 2003 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2339ER)
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Floor substitute printed 032682528-S1 (Saslaw)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Sen. Saslaw rejected 032682528-S1(17-Y 23-N)
- VOTE: FLOOR SUBSTITUTE (17-Y 23-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- VOTE: FLOOR AMENDMENT (15-Y 25-N)
- Passed Senate (27-Y 13-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (27-Y 13-N)
- Amendment by Sen. Edwards rejected (15-Y 25-N)
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (37-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 6-N)
On February 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: 4
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (88-Y 10-N 1-A)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 10-N 1-A)
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 033973253-H1
- Pending question ordered
- Committee substitute agreed to 033973253-H1
- Read second time
On January 28, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2003 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 033973253-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
On January 13, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 4
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 038869253
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
April 2, 2003: VOTE: REJECTED (26-Y 73-N)
February 19, 2003: VOTE: FLOOR SUBSTITUTE (17-Y 23-N)
February 19, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (27-Y 13-N)
February 19, 2003: VOTE: FLOOR AMENDMENT (15-Y 25-N)
February 17, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2003: Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 6-N)
January 30, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 10-N 1-A)
January 27, 2003: Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor