+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Education (16-Y 6-N)
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N)
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Education Reform
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented and ordered printed 15100765D
+ − Votes (2)
February 4, 2015: Reported from Education (16-Y 6-N)
February 3, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor