+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0127)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 127 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2338ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 11103932D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2338E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 6, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #2
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103932D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 18, 2011: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2011: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2011: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor