+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- Failed to report (defeated) in C. J. (5-Y 6-N)
On February 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 32-N)
- Read third time and passed House (67-Y 32-N)
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- Previous question ordered (86-Y 11-N)
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 030503253-H1
- VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION (86-Y 11-N)
- Amendment by Del. Moran rejected (32-Y 65-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (32-Y 65-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 030503253-H1
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 030503253-H1
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Referred from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 4
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 038876253
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 17, 2003: Failed to report (defeated) in C. J. (5-Y 6-N)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 32-N)
February 3, 2003: VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION (86-Y 11-N)
February 3, 2003: VOTE: REJECTED (32-Y 65-N)
January 31, 2003: Reported from C. J. with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2003: Referred from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor