+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 26, 2023 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0551)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 551 (effective 7/1/23)
On March 2, 2023 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2336ER)
- Enrolled
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (94-Y 6-N)
- Read third time and passed House (94-Y 6-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On January 31, 2023 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (20-Y 2-N)
On January 24, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2023 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 12, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed 23103571D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 14, 2023: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
February 13, 2023: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2023: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2023: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 6-N)
January 26, 2023: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 2-N)
January 24, 2023: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor