+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0399)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 399 (effective 7/1/15)
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15
On March 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2330ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 15105155D-S1 (95-Y 2-N)
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2330S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15105155D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 15105155D-S1
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N)
- Read third time and passed House (93-Y 4-N)
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104658D-H1
- Amendments by Delegate Kilgore agreed to
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB2330EH1
- Printed as engrossed 15104658D-EH1
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 15104658D-H1
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (15-Y 7-N)
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N)
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned ACNRsub: Agriculture
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented and ordered printed 15103468D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 25, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N)
February 24, 2015: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2015: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N)
February 4, 2015: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (15-Y 7-N)
February 2, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor