+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Incorporated by Tra. (HB38-Orrock) (15-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 11-N)
- Read third time and passed House (89-Y 11-N)
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (16-Y 6-N)
On January 19, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 2
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/04 047307284
+ − Votes (3)
March 4, 2004: Incorporated by Tra. (HB38-Orrock) (15-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 11-N)
January 29, 2004: Reported from Tra. (16-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor