+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Public Safety (Sherwood)
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 077764306
+ − Vote
January 22, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor