+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0678)
On March 28, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 678 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2323ER)
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (90-Y 10-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 10-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 990144106-E
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (78-Y 16-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended (78-Y 16-N)
- Title replaced
- Amendment by Mr. Albo agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Read second time
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 1, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture (18-Y 6-N)
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 990144106