+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 27, 2009 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0469)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 469 (effective 7/1/09)
On February 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2322ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 091403420-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2322E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 8, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting
On January 23, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: 2
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 091403420
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
February 23, 2009: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2009: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
February 20, 2009: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2009: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2009: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor