+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 19, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0395)
On March 15, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 395 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 1997 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 26, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2321ER)
On February 18, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 971637362-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 971637362-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 971637362-S1
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On January 17, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 971318362