+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0709)
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 709 (effective 7/1/03)
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2321ER)
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (37-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 17, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2003 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 036786888-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 15, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 14, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 036786888
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 20, 2003: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2003: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2003: Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 14, 2003: Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor