+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (48)
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0479)
On March 19, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 479 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2319ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 1-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 1-N)
On February 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (29-Y 10-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (29-Y 10-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Welch, O'Bannon, BaCote
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Rerras, Cuccinelli, Herring
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (7-Y 90-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House (7-Y 90-N)
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Floor substitute printed 077670732-S2 (Hanger)
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected 077666724-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB2319S2
- Reading of substitute waived
- Passed Senate with substitute (33-Y 7-N)
- VOTE: (33-Y 7-N)
- Substitute by Senator Hanger agreed to 077670732-S2
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 077666724-S1
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (87-Y 9-N 1-A)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 9-N 1-A)
On February 3, 2007 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB2319H1
- Substitute by Delegate Welch agreed to 071746552-H1
- Floor substitute printed 071746552-H1 (Welch)
- Read second time
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (15-Y 7-N)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 072401552
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
February 23, 2007: VOTE: (29-Y 10-N)
February 23, 2007: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 1-N)
February 20, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2007: VOTE: REJECTED (7-Y 90-N)
February 14, 2007: VOTE: (33-Y 7-N)
February 13, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2007: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 9-N 1-A)
February 1, 2007: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (15-Y 7-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor