+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0266)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 266 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2317ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Science and Technology (21-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103592D
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 2011: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2011: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2011: Reported from Science and Technology (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor