+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0741)
- Enacted, Chapter 741 (effective 7/1/15)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2316ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 0-N)
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's substitute printed 15105786D-H2
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15
On March 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2316ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 15105345D-S1 (99-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2316S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15105345D-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 15105345D-S1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Commerce and Labor
- Rereferred from Local Government (9-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2316H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104663D-H1
- Read second time
On February 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 15104663D-H1
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented and ordered printed 15103827D