+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 3, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0701)
On March 27, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 701 (effective 7/1/95)
On March 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 1995 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 22, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2315ER)
On February 16, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. w/amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Read first time
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 1-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Printed as reengrossed LD8432817-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Floor amendment agreed to (Albo)
- Read second time
- Engrossment reconsidered by House
On February 2, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed LD8432817-E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
On February 1, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 2
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed LD8432817
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 16, 1995: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1995: Reported from R. & S. S. w/amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N)
January 31, 1995: Reported from H. W. I. w/amendment (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor