+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (3-Y 12-N)
On January 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 41-N)
- Read third time and passed House (57-Y 41-N)
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (53-Y 40-N)
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute (53-Y 40-N) HB2315H1
- Substitute by Delegate Welch agreed to 073472552-H1
- Floor substitute printed 073472552-H1 (Welch)
- Read second time
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 4-N)
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: #2 (Ware, R.L.)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 078282552
+ − Votes (4)
February 14, 2007: Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (3-Y 12-N)
January 25, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 41-N)
January 24, 2007: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (53-Y 40-N)
January 22, 2007: Reported from Finance (17-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor