+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 26, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0423)
On March 16, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 423 (effective 7/1/03)
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2314ER)
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 9-N)
- Read third time and passed House (90-Y 9-N)
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 032939660-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 032939660-H1
- Read second time
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 032939660-H1
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from A., C. & N. R. w/substitute (19-Y 3-N)
On January 28, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to A., C. & N. R. sub-committee: 2
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 036652660