+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 5, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0644)
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 644 (effective 7/1/07)
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2313ER)
- Enrolled
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 17, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 072534380
+ − Votes (7)
February 14, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2007: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2007: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor