+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left in General Laws and Technology
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N)
- Read third time and passed House (54-Y 45-N)
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (13-Y 8-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed 21102870D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (4)
February 5, 2021: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N)
February 5, 2021: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2021: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
February 2, 2021: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 8-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor