+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0487)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 487 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2313ER)
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented and ordered printed 17103730D