+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 22, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0336)
On March 16, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 336 (effective 7/1/95)
On March 7, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 1995 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 24, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2313ER)
On February 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Civil Law
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 16-N)
- Read third time and passed House (82-Y 16-N)
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 10-N)
On January 27, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 3/4
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed LD4781254
+ − Votes (5)
February 17, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1995: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 16-N)
February 1, 1995: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 10-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor