+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (55-Y 42-N 2-A)
- Read third time and passed House (55-Y 42-N 2-A)
- Pending question ordered
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2312H2
- Committee Courts of Justice substitute agreed to 21104248D-H2
- Committee on General Laws substitute rejected 21104236D-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from Appropriations (14-Y 7-N)
On January 31, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 8-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 21104248D-H2
On January 30, 2021 in the House:
- Incorporates HB1815 (Heretick)
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Committee substitute printed 21104236D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (14-Y 6-N)
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N)
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed 21101659D
+ − Impact Statements (6)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 5, 2021: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 42-N 2-A)
February 3, 2021: Reported from Appropriations (14-Y 7-N)
January 31, 2021: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 8-N)
January 30, 2021: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N)
January 30, 2021: Reported from General Laws with substitute (14-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor