+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0282)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 282 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2308ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 15101668D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2308E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented and ordered printed 15101668D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 20, 2015: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2015: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2015: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor