+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0101)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 101 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2017
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/14/17
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2308ER)
- Enrolled
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (84-Y 10-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (84-Y 10-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments by Senator Obenshain agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 25-N)
- Read third time and passed House (74-Y 25-N)
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (15-Y 4-N)
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: #1
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Presented and ordered printed 17103295D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 10, 2017: VOTE: ADOPTION (84-Y 10-N)
February 8, 2017: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2017: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2017: VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 25-N)
January 20, 2017: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (15-Y 4-N)
January 19, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor