+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0851)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 851 (effective 7/1/19)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 3, 2019
- Communicated to Governor
- VOTE: REJECTED (47-Y 49-N)
- House rejected Governor's recommendation (47-Y 49-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2306ER)
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Rereferred from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 19101103D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2306E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101103D