+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0357)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 357 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2305ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 13105065D-S1 (96-Y 2-N)
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2305S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13105065D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 13105065D-S1
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed 13103065D
+ − Votes (7)
February 18, 2013: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
February 14, 2013: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2013: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2013: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor