+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0501)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 501 (effective 7/1/11)
On March 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2303ER)
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (78-Y 15-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (78-Y 15-N)
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Delegates: Brink, Stolle, O'Bannon
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senators: Puller, Edwards, Blevins
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 95-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 11105385D-S1 (3-Y 95-N)
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 11105385D-S1
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2303S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of dispensing with constitutional reading agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 11105385D-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Rules sub: #1
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 15-N)
- Read third time and passed House (82-Y 15-N)
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 11101046D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2303E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendment (9-Y 6-N)
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101046D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (12)
February 26, 2011: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION (78-Y 15-N)
February 24, 2011: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2011: VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 95-N)
February 22, 2011: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2011: Reconsideration of passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2011: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2011: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 15-N)
January 25, 2011: Reported from Rules with amendment (9-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor