+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (53)
On March 26, 2023 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 546 (effective 7/1/23)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546)
On March 13, 2023 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2302ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed by temporarily
On February 25, 2023 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 23107546D-H3
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by House (67-Y 29-N)
- VOTE: Adoption (67-Y 29-N)
On February 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senators: Newman, McPike, Surovell
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 23, 2023 in the House:
- Delegates: Adams, L.R., Austin, Murphy
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (4-Y 89-N)
- Senate substitute with amendments rejected by House 23107151D-S1 (4-Y 89-N)
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed by temporarily
- Reading of substitute waived
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 23107151D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments HB2302S1
- Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (39-Y 1-N)
- Committee amendments agreed to
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (15-Y 1-N)
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 23107151D-S1
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (63-Y 35-N)
- Read third time and passed House (63-Y 35-N)
On February 6, 2023 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2302H2
- Committee on Transportation substitute rejected 23105732D-H1
- Committee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 23106174D-H2
On February 5, 2023 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2023 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 23106174D-H2
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 23105732D-H1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
On January 18, 2023 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 Transportation Infrastructure and Funding
On January 11, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed 23103984D
+ − Impact Statements (4)
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (11)
February 25, 2023: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
February 25, 2023: VOTE: Adoption (67-Y 29-N)
February 23, 2023: Senate insisted on substitute with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2023: VOTE: REJECTED (4-Y 89-N)
February 22, 2023: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (39-Y 1-N)
February 21, 2023: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2023: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (15-Y 1-N)
February 16, 2023: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2023: VOTE: Passage (63-Y 35-N)
February 3, 2023: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2023: Reported from Transportation with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor