+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0813)
- Enacted, Chapter 813 (effective 7/1/09)
On April 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2300ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2300ER)
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 2-N)
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 094102820
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 8, 2009: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
April 8, 2009: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2009: Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N)
February 13, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2009: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 2-N)
January 30, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2009: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor