+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 21103718D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2300H1
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 21103718D-H1
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Health
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented and ordered printed 21103156D