+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Motion to override Governor's veto rejected (49-Y 51-N)
- VOTE: (49-Y 51-N)
- House sustained Governor's veto
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB230ER)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (29-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 984410300
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: (49-Y 51-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1998: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1998: Reported from Appropriations (29-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor