+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (47)
On March 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: STRIKE FROM CALENDAR (40-Y 0-N)
- Stricken from Senate calendar (40-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on amendments (33-Y 7-N)
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate amendments rejected by House (6-Y 87-N)
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Motion to recede from amds. rejected (15-Y 24-N)
- VOTE: RECEDE FROM SENATE AMDT. (15-Y 24-N)
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (6-Y 87-N)
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (33-Y 7-N)
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senators: Saslaw, Holland, C. A., Stolle
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- Delegates: Copeland, Clement, Wagner
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate requested conference committee
On March 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments agreed to (23-Y 15-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Passed Senate with amendments (37-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: COMMITTEE AMENDMENTS (23-Y 15-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed by temporarily
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 2-N)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
- Passed by for the day
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Committee amendments reconsidered (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/amds. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On February 8, 1994 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (88-Y 11-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 11-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Read second time
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD8821482 (HB230H1)
- Reported from R. & I. N. w/sub. (18-Y 3-N)
On January 24, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to R. & I. N. sub-committee: 2
On January 17, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (11)
March 12, 1994: VOTE: STRIKE FROM CALENDAR (40-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: REJECTED (6-Y 87-N)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (33-Y 7-N)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: RECEDE FROM SENATE AMDT. (15-Y 24-N)
March 9, 1994: VOTE: COMMITTEE AMENDMENTS (23-Y 15-N)
March 9, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 2-N)
March 8, 1994: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1994: Reported from Transportation w/amds. (15-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 11-N)
February 3, 1994: Reported from R. & I. N. w/sub. (18-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor